+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On February 27, 1996 in the Senate:
- Passed by indefinitely in P. & E. (8-Y 7-N)
- Reconsidered by Privileges and Elections
On February 20, 1996 in the Senate:
- Continued to 1997 in P. & E. (15-Y 0-N)
On February 2, 1996 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Reading waived
On February 1, 1996 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: ADOPTION (55-Y 42-N)
- Agreed to by House (55-Y 42-N)
- Pending question ordered
- Engrossed by House
On January 30, 1996 in the House:
- Reported from Rules (6-Y 4-N)
On January 22, 1996 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Presented & ordered printed 961692432
+ − Votes (4)
February 27, 1996: Passed by indefinitely in P. & E. (8-Y 7-N)
February 20, 1996: Continued to 1997 in P. & E. (15-Y 0-N)
February 1, 1996: VOTE: ADOPTION (55-Y 42-N)
January 30, 1996: Reported from Rules (6-Y 4-N)
+ − Sponsors (20)
Type:
Primary Sponsor