+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (9)
On March 8, 2008 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ150ER)
On January 17, 2008 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
On January 14, 2008 in the Senate:
- Laid on Clerk's Desk
- Received
On January 11, 2008 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Agreed to by House by voice vote
- Engrossed by House
On January 10, 2008 in the House:
- Introduced bill reprinted 085110604
On January 8, 2008 in the House:
- Prefiled and laid on Speaker's table; offered 01/09/08 085110604