+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On December 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Left in Rules
On February 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Continued to 2015 in Rules by voice vote
On February 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Reading waived
On February 5, 2014 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (70-Y 24-N)
- Agreed to by House (70-Y 24-N)
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HJ147H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 14104715D-H1
- Taken up
On January 31, 2014 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 14104715D-H1
- Reported from Rules with substitute (12-Y 3-N)
On January 30, 2014 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (3-Y 1-N)
On January 28, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned Rules sub: Studies
On January 14, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Presented and ordered printed 14103841D
- Unanimous consent to introduce