+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On February 29, 2012 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ144ER)
On February 28, 2012 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
- Read third time
On February 27, 2012 in the Senate:
- Reading waived (40-Y 0-N)
On February 24, 2012 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules by voice vote
On January 23, 2012 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Reading waived
On January 20, 2012 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N)
- Agreed to by House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House
- Taken up
On January 17, 2012 in the House:
- Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N)
On January 11, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12101189D
+ − Votes (3)
February 27, 2012: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N)
January 20, 2012: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N)
January 17, 2012: Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (34)
Type:
Primary Sponsor