+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On April 9, 1996 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ140ER)
On March 6, 1996 in the Senate:
- Read third time and agreed to by Senate by voice vote
On March 5, 1996 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
- Reading waived (39-Y 0-N)
On March 4, 1996 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules
On February 9, 1996 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Read first time
On February 8, 1996 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Agreed to by House (Block Vote) (100-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House
On February 6, 1996 in the House:
- Reported from Rules (10-Y 0-N)
On January 22, 1996 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Presented & ordered printed 961838388