+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (10)
On May 10, 2000 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ139ER)
On February 3, 2000 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
- Taken up
On January 31, 2000 in the Senate:
- Laid on Clerk's Desk
- Received
On January 28, 2000 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Agreed to by House by voice vote
- Engrossed by House
On January 25, 2000 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 000306680-E
On January 21, 2000 in the House:
- Presented and laid on Speaker's table 000306680
+ − Sponsors (62)
Type:
Primary Sponsor