+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On March 11, 2010 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ134ER)
On March 9, 2010 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
- Read third time
On March 8, 2010 in the Senate:
- Reading waived (40-Y 0-N)
On March 5, 2010 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules by voice vote
On February 19, 2010 in the Senate:
- Assigned Rules sub: #1
On February 1, 2010 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Reading waived
On January 29, 2010 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (89-Y 0-N)
- Agreed to by House BLOCK VOTE (89-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House
- Taken up
On January 26, 2010 in the House:
- Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N)
On January 18, 2010 in the House:
- Assigned Rules sub: #3 Studies
On January 13, 2010 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10101038D
+ − Votes (3)
March 8, 2010: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N)
January 29, 2010: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (89-Y 0-N)
January 26, 2010: Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor