+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On March 1, 2002 in the Senate:
- Failed to report (defeated) in Rules (3-Y 5-N 2-A)
On February 12, 2002 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Reading waived
On February 11, 2002 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: REJECTED (86-Y 11-N)
- Agreed to by House (86-Y 11-N)
- Engrossed by House
- VOTE: ADOPTION (41-Y 54-N)
- Amendment by Del. Darner rejected (41-Y 54-N)
- Taken up
On February 9, 2002 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 7, 2002 in the House:
- Reported from H. W. I. (16-Y 5-N)
On January 9, 2002 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/09/02 022611760