+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On March 3, 2020 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ133ER)
On March 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
- Read third time
On March 2, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reading waived (40-Y 0-N)
On February 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules by voice vote
On January 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Reading waived
On January 29, 2020 in the House:
- VOTE: Block Vote Passage (95-Y 0-N)
- Agreed to by House BLOCK VOTE (95-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House
- Taken up
On January 24, 2020 in the House:
- Reported from Rules (18-Y 0-N)
On January 10, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Presented and ordered printed 20104141D
+ − Votes (3)
March 2, 2020: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N)
January 29, 2020: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (95-Y 0-N)
January 24, 2020: Reported from Rules (18-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Mark L. Keam
Type:
Primary Sponsor