+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On May 20, 1998 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ133ER)
On February 5, 1998 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
- Taken up
On February 2, 1998 in the Senate:
- Laid on Clerk's Desk
- Received
On January 30, 1998 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Agreed to by House by voice vote
- Engrossed by House
On January 23, 1998 in the House:
- Presented and laid on Speaker's table 982808297
+ − Sponsors (31)
Type:
Primary Sponsor