+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On May 10, 2000 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ13ER)
On January 27, 2000 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
- Taken up
On January 24, 2000 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules by voice vote
On January 20, 2000 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Taken up
On January 17, 2000 in the Senate:
- Laid on Clerk's Desk
- Received
On January 14, 2000 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Agreed to by House by voice vote
- Engrossed by House
On January 13, 2000 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 000213840-E
On January 12, 2000 in the House:
- Presented and laid on Speaker's table 000213840
- Prefiled; 01/07/00
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor