+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (8)
On January 23, 2014 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ125ER)
On January 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate
On January 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Laid on Clerk's Desk
- Received
On January 17, 2014 in the House:
- Agreed to by House
- Engrossed by House
On January 13, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced bill reprinted 14100720D
On January 10, 2014 in the House:
- Presented and laid on Speaker's table 14100720D
+ − Sponsors (42)
Type:
Primary Sponsor