+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On March 11, 2004 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House (HR12ER)
On March 1, 2004 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (61-Y 35-N)
- Agreed to by House (61-Y 35-N)
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Pending question ordered
- Amendments by Del. Jones, S.C. agreed to
- Taken up
On February 27, 2004 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 25, 2004 in the House:
- Reported from Rules (14-Y 2-N)
On February 10, 2004 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Presented & ordered printed 042596396
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
March 1, 2004: VOTE: ADOPTION (61-Y 35-N)
February 25, 2004: Reported from Rules (14-Y 2-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor