+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (25)
On March 26, 1996 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ110ER)
On March 4, 1996 in the Senate:
- Title replaced
On March 4, 1996 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 1-N)
- Senate amendments agreed to by House (98-Y 1-N)
On March 1, 1996 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 29, 1996 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate with amendments by voice vote
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Reading of amendments waived
- Read third time
On February 28, 1996 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Reading waived (40-Y 0-N)
On February 26, 1996 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules with amendments
On February 9, 1996 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Read first time
On February 8, 1996 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 2-N)
- Agreed to by House (98-Y 2-N)
- Engrossed by House - com. sub. 961877120-H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 961877120-H1
On February 6, 1996 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 961877120-H1
- Reported from Rules with substitute (8-Y 2-N)
On January 25, 1996 in the House:
- Assigned to Rules sub-committee: 3
On January 22, 1996 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Presented & ordered printed 965726828
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
March 4, 1996: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 1-N)
February 28, 1996: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
February 8, 1996: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 2-N)
February 6, 1996: Reported from Rules with substitute (8-Y 2-N)
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor