+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (19)
On June 14, 1996 in the House:
- Study Committee Members Appointed
On March 26, 1996 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ11ER)
On February 29, 1996 in the Senate:
- Read third time and agreed to by Senate by voice vote
On February 28, 1996 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Reading waived (40-Y 0-N)
On February 26, 1996 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules
On February 9, 1996 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Read first time
On February 8, 1996 in the House:
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendments agreed to
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Printed as engrossed 960213344-E
- Agreed to by House (Block Vote) (100-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 6, 1996 in the House:
- Reported from Rules with amendments (10-Y 0-N)
On January 25, 1996 in the House:
- Assigned to Rules sub-committee: 3
On January 15, 1996 in the House:
- Introduced bill reprinted 960213344
On January 10, 1996 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Presented & ordered printed 960213344
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
February 28, 1996: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
February 8, 1996: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 6, 1996: Reported from Rules with amendments (10-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor