+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On April 12, 1994 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ108ER)
On March 8, 1994 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
- Read third time
On March 7, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: SUSPEND THE RULES (40-Y 0-N)
- Reading waived
- Rules suspended (40-Y 0-N)
On March 3, 1994 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules
On February 3, 1994 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Reading waived
On February 2, 1994 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
- Agreed to by House (Block Vote) (97-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House
On January 31, 1994 in the House:
- Reported from Rules (10-Y 0-N)
On January 24, 1994 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Presented and ordered printed
+ − Votes (3)
March 7, 1994: VOTE: SUSPEND THE RULES (40-Y 0-N)
February 2, 1994: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
January 31, 1994: Reported from Rules (10-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor