+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ98ER)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (94-Y 0-N)
- Senate amendments agreed to by House (94-Y 0-N)
- Placed on Calendar
On March 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate with amendments by voice vote
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Reading of amendments waived
- Read third time
On March 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reading waived (38-Y 0-N)
On February 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules with amendments by voice vote
On February 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reading waived
- Referred to Committee on Rules
On February 9, 2018 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
- Agreed to by House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
- Printed as engrossed 18104018D-E
- Engrossed by House as amended HJ98E
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Taken up
On February 6, 2018 in the House:
- Reported from Rules with amendments (17-Y 0-N)
On February 1, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N)
On January 19, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned Rules sub: Subcommittee #1
On January 9, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18104018D
+ − Votes (5)
March 6, 2018: VOTE: ADOPTION (94-Y 0-N)
March 2, 2018: Reading waived (38-Y 0-N)
February 9, 2018: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
February 6, 2018: Reported from Rules with amendments (17-Y 0-N)
February 1, 2018: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor