+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On June 3, 1998 in the House:
- Study Committee Members Appointed
On April 8, 1998 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ90ER)
On March 10, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read third time and agreed to by Senate by voice vote
On March 9, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reading waived, passed by for the day (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: SUSPEND THE RULES R (40-Y 0-N)
On March 6, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules by voice vote
On February 19, 1998 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Rules sub-committee: Studies
On February 6, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reading waived
- Referred to Committee on Rules
On February 5, 1998 in the House:
- Engrossed by House
- Agreed to by House (73-Y 23-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (73-Y 23-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 3, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from Rules (10-Y 3-N)
On January 21, 1998 in the House:
- Presented & ordered printed 987296144
- Referred to Committee on Rules