+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Senate substitute agreed to by House 18107318D-S1 (95-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (95-Y 0-N)
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ86ER)
On March 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 18107318D-S1
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HJ86S1
- Agreed to by Senate with substitute by voice vote
On March 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reading waived (38-Y 0-N)
On February 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules with substitute by voice vote
- Committee substitute printed 18107318D-S1
On February 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reading waived
- Referred to Committee on Rules
On February 12, 2018 in the House:
- Taken up
- Engrossed by House
- Agreed to by House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of passage agreed to by House
- Agreed to by House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION #2 (98-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 2018 in the House:
- Reported from Rules (16-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 0-N)
On January 19, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned Rules sub: Subcommittee #2
On January 9, 2018 in the House:
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18104665D
- Referred to Committee on Rules