+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (8)
On February 8, 2013 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ777ER)
On February 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
On February 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Laid on Clerk's Desk
- Received
On February 1, 2013 in the House:
- Agreed to by House by voice vote
- Engrossed by House
On January 29, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced bill reprinted 13104599D
On January 28, 2013 in the House:
- Presented and laid on Speaker's table 13104599D
+ − Sponsors (31)
Type:
Primary Sponsor