+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On February 22, 2003 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ769ER)
On February 13, 2003 in the Senate:
- Read third time and agreed to by Senate by voice vote
On February 12, 2003 in the Senate:
- Reading waived, passed by for the day
- VOTE: SUSPEND THE RULES R (40-Y 0-N)
- Rules suspended (40-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 2003 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules by voice vote
On January 27, 2003 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Reading waived
On January 24, 2003 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Agreed to by House by voice vote
- Printed as engrossed 033677876-E
- Engrossed by House
- Taken up
On January 17, 2003 in the House:
- Presented and laid on Speaker's table 033677876