+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (19)
On March 10, 2009 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ730ER)
On February 24, 2009 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
On February 23, 2009 in the Senate:
- Reading waived (40-Y 0-N)
On February 20, 2009 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules by voice vote
On February 12, 2009 in the Senate:
- Assigned Rules sub: Studies
On February 2, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Reading waived
On January 30, 2009 in the House:
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Taken up
- Agreed to by House BLOCK VOTE (96-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House as amended HJ730E
- Printed as engrossed 094184676-E
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N)
On January 27, 2009 in the House:
- Reported from Rules with amendment (13-Y 0-N)
On January 22, 2009 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s)
On January 16, 2009 in the House:
- Assigned Rules sub: Studies
On January 14, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/09 094184676