+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (33)
On March 11, 2009 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ722ER)
On February 27, 2009 in the House:
- VOTE: --- ADOPTION (95-Y 0-N)
- Conference report agreed to by House (95-Y 0-N)
On February 27, 2009 in the Senate:
- Conference report agreed to by Senate by voice vote
On February 26, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senators: Edwards, Locke, Quayle
- Conferees appointed by Senate
On February 26, 2009 in the House:
- Delegates: Landes, Abbitt, Hall
- Conferees appointed by House
- House acceded to request
On February 26, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate requested conference committee
- Senate insisted on substitute (38-Y 0-N)
On February 26, 2009 in the House:
- VOTE: --- REJECTED (1-Y 92-N)
- Senate substitute rejected by House (1-Y 92-N)
On February 25, 2009 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 24, 2009 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 097337592-S1
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HJ722S1
- Agreed to by Senate with substitute by voice vote
On February 23, 2009 in the Senate:
- Reading waived (40-Y 0-N)
On February 20, 2009 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 097337592-S1
- Reported from Rules with substitute by voice vote
On January 26, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Reading waived
On January 23, 2009 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 098197592-E
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N)
- Agreed to by House BLOCK VOTE (96-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House as amended HJ722E
- Amendments by Delegate Landes agreed to
- Taken up
On January 20, 2009 in the House:
- Reported from Rules (14-Y 0-N)
On January 14, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/09 098197592
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (6)
February 27, 2009: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (95-Y 0-N)
February 26, 2009: VOTE: --- REJECTED (1-Y 92-N)
February 26, 2009: Senate insisted on substitute (38-Y 0-N)
February 23, 2009: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N)
January 23, 2009: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N)
January 20, 2009: Reported from Rules (14-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor