+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On February 20, 2015 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ715ER)
On February 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
On February 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules by voice vote
On February 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Reading waived
On February 4, 2015 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (95-Y 0-N)
- Agreed to by House Block Vote (95-Y 0-N)
- Printed as engrossed 15100922D-E
- Engrossed by House as amended HJ715E
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Taken up
On January 30, 2015 in the House:
- Reported from Rules with amendments (15-Y 0-N)
On January 27, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Presented and ordered printed 15100922D
- Unanimous consent to introduce
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
February 4, 2015: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (95-Y 0-N)
January 30, 2015: Reported from Rules with amendments (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor