+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On February 18, 2005 in the Senate:
- Left in Rules
On January 31, 2005 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Reading waived
On January 28, 2005 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (93-Y 0-N)
- Agreed to by House BLOCK VOTE (93-Y 0-N)
- Printed as engrossed 059037456-E
- Engrossed by House as amended HJ693E
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Taken up
On January 26, 2005 in the House:
- Reported from Rules with amendment (16-Y 0-N)
On January 12, 2005 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Prefiled & ordered printed; offered 01/12/05 059037456
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
January 28, 2005: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (93-Y 0-N)
January 26, 2005: Reported from Rules with amendment (16-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor