+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (18)
On February 16, 2001 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ689ER)
On February 14, 2001 in the Senate:
- Read third time and agreed to by Senate by voice vote
On February 13, 2001 in the Senate:
- Reading waived
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Rules suspended (40-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 2001 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules by voice vote
On February 7, 2001 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Reading waived
On February 1, 2001 in the House:
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Taken up
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Communicated to Senate
- Agreed to by House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
- Printed as engrossed 018938884-E
On January 30, 2001 in the House:
- Reported from Tra. w/amd (25-Y 0-N)
On January 10, 2001 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/10/01 018938884
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
February 13, 2001: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
February 1, 2001: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
January 30, 2001: Reported from Tra. w/amd (25-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor