+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On March 22, 1999 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ678ER)
On February 18, 1999 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
- Read third time
On February 17, 1999 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Reading waived (40-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 1999 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules by voice vote
On February 8, 1999 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Reading waived
On February 7, 1999 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: ADOPTION (80-Y 17-N)
- Agreed to by House (80-Y 17-N)
- Engrossed by House
- Taken up
On February 5, 1999 in the House:
- Reported from Education (24-Y 0-N)
On January 21, 1999 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education
- Presented & ordered printed 991079324