+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On February 18, 2003 in the Senate:
- Left in Privileges and Elections
On February 4, 2003 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Reading waived
On February 3, 2003 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: ADOPTION (94-Y 0-N)
- Agreed to by House (94-Y 0-N)
- Printed as engrossed 036566926-E
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Taken up
On January 31, 2003 in the House:
- Reported from P. & E. w/amendment (20-Y 1-N)
- Reconsidered by Privileges and Elections
On January 24, 2003 in the House:
- Tabled in Privileges & Elections (10-Y 9-N)
On January 20, 2003 in the House:
- Assigned to P. & E. sub-committee: 1
On January 8, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/08/03 036566926
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
February 3, 2003: VOTE: ADOPTION (94-Y 0-N)
January 31, 2003: Reported from P. & E. w/amendment (20-Y 1-N)
January 24, 2003: Tabled in Privileges & Elections (10-Y 9-N)
+ − Sponsors (64)
Type:
Primary Sponsor