+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (21)
On February 21, 2013 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ650ER)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
- Senate substitute agreed to by House 13105247D-S1 (98-Y 0-N)
On February 19, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate with substitute by voice vote
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HJ650S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 13105247D-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
On February 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reading waived (40-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules with substitute by voice vote
- Committee substitute printed 13105247D-S1
On January 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Reading waived
On January 18, 2013 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N)
- Agreed to by House BLOCK VOTE (96-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House
- Taken up
On January 15, 2013 in the House:
- Reported from Rules (14-Y 0-N)
On January 9, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced bill reprinted 13101703D
On January 8, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13101703D
+ − Votes (4)
February 21, 2013: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
February 18, 2013: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N)
January 18, 2013: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N)
January 15, 2013: Reported from Rules (14-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor