+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On March 12, 1997 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ647ER)
On February 19, 1997 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
- Read third time
On February 18, 1997 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
- Reading waived, passed by for the day (39-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 1997 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules by voice vote
On February 6, 1997 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Reading waived (40-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 1997 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Agreed to by House (Block Vote) (100-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House
On February 3, 1997 in the House:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (22-Y 0-N)
On January 23, 1997 in the House:
- Assigned to C. J. sub-committee: 1
On January 20, 1997 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Presented & ordered printed 973645442
+ − Votes (3)
February 18, 1997: VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
February 4, 1997: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 3, 1997: Reported from Courts of Justice (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor