+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (18)
On March 11, 1997 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ638ER)
On February 19, 1997 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
On February 18, 1997 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
- Reading waived, passed by for the day (39-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 1997 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules by voice vote
On January 30, 1997 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Reading waived (37-Y 0-N)
On January 29, 1997 in the House:
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Title replaced
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Printed as engrossed 971675388-E
- Agreed to by House (Block Vote) (99-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On January 27, 1997 in the House:
- Reported from Education with amendments (22-Y 0-N)
On January 20, 1997 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education
- Presented & ordered printed 971675388