+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (26)
On March 26, 2007 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ627ER)
On February 22, 2007 in the House:
- Senate amendment agreed to by House (97-Y 0-N)
- Placed on Calendar
- VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N)
On February 21, 2007 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate with amendment by voice vote
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read third time
On February 20, 2007 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
- Reading waived (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Motion to reconsider Passed by for the day agreed to (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed by for the day
On February 19, 2007 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules with amendment by voice vote
On January 22, 2007 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Reading waived
On January 19, 2007 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N)
- Agreed to by House BLOCK VOTE (96-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House
- Taken up
On January 17, 2007 in the House:
- Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N)
On January 8, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/07 072313524
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (5)
February 22, 2007: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N)
February 20, 2007: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
February 20, 2007: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
January 19, 2007: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N)
January 17, 2007: Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor