+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On February 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed by indefinitely in Privileges and Elections (12-Y 3-N)
On January 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reading waived
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
On January 29, 2013 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N)
- Agreed to by House (99-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HJ622H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 13104584D-H1
- Taken up
On January 25, 2013 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 13104584D-H1
- Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
On January 21, 2013 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 0-N)
On January 11, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned P & E sub: Constitutional Amendments Subcommittee
On January 7, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13102211D
+ − Votes (4)
February 12, 2013: Passed by indefinitely in Privileges and Elections (12-Y 3-N)
January 29, 2013: VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N)
January 25, 2013: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
January 21, 2013: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor