+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On March 23, 1995 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ618ER)
On February 23, 1995 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (92-Y 0-N)
- Senate amendment agreed to by House (92-Y 0-N)
On February 22, 1995 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 21, 1995 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate with amendment by voice vote
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read third time
On February 20, 1995 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Reading waived (40-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 1995 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules with amendment
On February 8, 1995 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Read first time
On February 7, 1995 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Agreed to by House (Block Vote) (100-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House - com. sub. LD4425148-H1
- Committee substitute agreed to LD4425148-H1
On February 6, 1995 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 4, 1995 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed LD4425148-H1
- Reported from Rules with substitute (9-Y 0-N)
On January 23, 1995 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Presented & ordered printed LD0278312
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
February 23, 1995: VOTE: ADOPTION (92-Y 0-N)
February 20, 1995: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
February 7, 1995: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 4, 1995: Reported from Rules with substitute (9-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor