+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (9)
On January 24, 2013 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ616ER)
On January 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate
On January 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Laid on Clerk's Desk
- Received
On January 18, 2013 in the House:
- Agreed to by House
- Engrossed by House
On January 11, 2013 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On January 9, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced bill reprinted 13103122D
On January 7, 2013 in the House:
- Prefiled and laid on Speaker's table; offered 01/09/13 13103122D