+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On February 25, 2015 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ607ER)
On February 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
- Read third time
On February 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reading waived (40-Y 0-N)
On February 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules by voice vote
On January 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Reading waived
On January 28, 2015 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
- Agreed to by House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House
- Taken up
On January 23, 2015 in the House:
- Reported from Rules (14-Y 0-N)
On January 13, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15100001D