+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On March 22, 1999 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ599ER)
On February 18, 1999 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
On February 17, 1999 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Reading waived (40-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 1999 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules by voice vote
On February 8, 1999 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Reading waived
On February 5, 1999 in the House:
- Engrossed by House
- Taken up
- Communicated to Senate
- Agreed to by House (Block Vote) (100-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
On February 3, 1999 in the House:
- Reported from Rules (13-Y 0-N)
On January 28, 1999 in the House:
- Assigned to Rules sub-committee: 3
On January 20, 1999 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Presented & ordered printed 992483112
+ − Votes (3)
February 17, 1999: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
February 5, 1999: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 3, 1999: Reported from Rules (13-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor