+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (19)
On April 28, 1998 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ59ER)
On March 10, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read third time and agreed to by Senate by voice vote
On March 9, 1998 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: SUSPEND THE RULES R (40-Y 0-N)
- Reading waived, passed by for the day
On March 6, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules by voice vote
On February 19, 1998 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Rules sub-committee: Studies
On February 4, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reading waived
- Referred to Committee on Rules
On February 3, 1998 in the House:
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Printed as engrossed 982900112-E
- Agreed to by House (97-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On January 30, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from C. J. with amendments (23-Y 0-N)
On January 26, 1998 in the House:
- Assigned to C. J. sub-committee: 2
On January 16, 1998 in the House:
- Presented & ordered printed 982900112
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
March 9, 1998: VOTE: SUSPEND THE RULES R (40-Y 0-N)
February 3, 1998: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
January 30, 1998: Reported from C. J. with amendments (23-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor