+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On February 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Privileges and Elections (15-Y 0-N)
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Reading waived
On February 4, 2021 in the House:
- VOTE: Agree To (60-Y 33-N)
- Agreed to by House (60-Y 33-N)
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HJ582H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 21104282D-H1
- Taken up
On February 3, 2021 in the House:
On February 1, 2021 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (4-Y 2-N)
On January 20, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned P & E sub: Constitutional Amendments
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Presented and ordered printed 21102567D