+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On April 25, 1997 in the House:
- Study Committee Members Appointed
On March 11, 1997 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ570ER)
On February 19, 1997 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
- Read third time
On February 18, 1997 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
- Reading waived, passed by for the day (39-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 1997 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules by voice vote
On February 2, 1997 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
On January 31, 1997 in the Senate:
- Reading waived (36-Y 4-N)
On January 30, 1997 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Agreed to by House (Block Vote) (100-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House
On January 28, 1997 in the House:
- Reported from Rules (10-Y 0-N)
On January 22, 1997 in the House:
- Assigned to Rules sub-committee: 3
On January 20, 1997 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Presented & ordered printed 973381188