+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (24)
On March 10, 1997 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ540ER)
On February 20, 1997 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N)
- Senate substitute agreed to by House (97-Y 0-N)
- Placed on Calendar
On February 19, 1997 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate with substitute by voice vote
- Engrossed by Senate - comm. sub. 971858160-S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 971858160-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read third time
On February 18, 1997 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
- Reading waived, passed by for the day (39-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 1997 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules with substitute by voice vote
- Committee substitute printed 971858160-S1
On January 30, 1997 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Reading waived (37-Y 0-N)
On January 29, 1997 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Agreed to by House (Block Vote) (99-Y 0-N)
- Printed as engrossed 973707160-E
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendments agreed to
On January 27, 1997 in the House:
- Reported from Education with amendments (22-Y 0-N)
On January 20, 1997 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education
- Presented & ordered printed 973707160
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
February 20, 1997: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N)
February 18, 1997: VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
January 29, 1997: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
January 27, 1997: Reported from Education with amendments (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor