+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (20)
On March 24, 1995 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ534ER)
On February 21, 1995 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
- Read third time
On February 20, 1995 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Reading waived (40-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 1995 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules
On February 6, 1995 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Read first time
On February 4, 1995 in the House:
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Agreed to by House (Block Vote) (100-Y 0-N)
- Printed as engrossed LD0960164-E
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 3, 1995 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 2, 1995 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 1, 1995 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On January 30, 1995 in the House:
- Reported from Rules with amendments (9-Y 0-N)
On January 23, 1995 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Presented & ordered printed LD0960164