+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On February 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Rules (15-Y 0-N)
On January 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Reading waived
On January 26, 2021 in the House:
- VOTE: Agree To (98-Y 0-N)
- Agreed to by House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House
- Taken up
On January 22, 2021 in the House:
- Reported from Rules (18-Y 0-N)
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 0-N)
On January 20, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned Rules sub: Studies
On January 7, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21102405D
+ − Votes (5)
February 5, 2021: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Rules (15-Y 0-N)
January 26, 2021: VOTE: Agree To (98-Y 0-N)
January 26, 2021: VOTE: Agree To (98-Y 0-N)
January 22, 2021: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 0-N)
January 22, 2021: Reported from Rules (18-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor