+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On April 10, 1998 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ52ER)
On March 10, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read third time and agreed to by Senate by voice vote
On March 9, 1998 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: SUSPEND THE RULES R (40-Y 0-N)
- Reading waived, passed by for the day
On March 6, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules by voice vote
On February 19, 1998 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Rules sub-committee: Studies
On February 3, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reading waived
- Referred to Committee on Rules
On February 2, 1998 in the House:
- Engrossed by House
- Agreed to by House (86-Y 10-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (86-Y 10-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On January 30, 1998 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On January 28, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from Privileges and Elections (23-Y 0-N)
On January 20, 1998 in the House:
- Assigned to P. & E. sub-committee: 1
On January 15, 1998 in the House:
- Presented & ordered printed 982764476
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections