+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (25)
On March 17, 1995 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ481ER)
On February 23, 1995 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
- Senate substitute agreed to by House (98-Y 0-N)
On February 22, 1995 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 21, 1995 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate with substitute by voice vote
- Engrossed by Senate - comm. sub. LD3038382-S1
- Committee substitute agreed to LD3038382-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read third time
On February 20, 1995 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Reading waived (40-Y 0-N)
On February 19, 1995 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed LD3038382-S1
On February 17, 1995 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules with substitute
On February 6, 1995 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Read first time
On February 4, 1995 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Agreed to by House (Block Vote) (100-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House - com. sub. LD3706382-H1
- Committee substitute agreed to LD3706382-H1
On February 3, 1995 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed LD3706382-H1
On February 2, 1995 in the House:
- Reported from Rules with substitute (9-Y 0-N)
On January 27, 1995 in the House:
- Assigned to Rules sub-committee: 3
On January 19, 1995 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Presented & ordered printed LD4764382
+ − Votes (4)
February 23, 1995: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
February 20, 1995: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
February 4, 1995: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 2, 1995: Reported from Rules with substitute (9-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor