+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (22)
On June 4, 1998 in the House:
- Study Committee Members Appointed
On April 8, 1998 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ432ER)
On March 13, 1998 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: SUSPEND THE RULES R (40-Y 0-N)
- Discharged from Rules
- Taken up for immediate consideration
- Readings waived
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
On March 12, 1998 in the House:
- Amendment by Mr. Thomas agreed to
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Printed as engrossed 981211152-E
- Agreed to by House (96-Y 2-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 2-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On March 12, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reading waived
- Referred to Committee on Rules
On March 11, 1998 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On March 10, 1998 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On March 6, 1998 in the House:
- Consent to introduce
- Presented & ordered printed 981211152
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Reported from Rules (14-Y 1-N)
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
March 13, 1998: VOTE: SUSPEND THE RULES R (40-Y 0-N)
March 12, 1998: VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 2-N)
March 6, 1998: Reported from Rules (14-Y 1-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor