+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (20)
On May 20, 1998 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ430ER)
On April 28, 1998 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ430ER)
On March 13, 1998 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended (36-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: SUSPEND THE RULES R (36-Y 0-N)
- Discharged from Rules
- Taken up for immediate consideration
- Readings waived
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
On March 12, 1998 in the House:
- Engrossed by House
- Agreed to by House (Block Vote) (100-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On March 12, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reading waived
- Referred to Committee on Rules
On March 11, 1998 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On March 10, 1998 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On March 6, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N)
On March 5, 1998 in the House:
- Consent to introduce
- Presented & ordered printed 985807127
- Referred to Committee on Rules
+ − Votes (3)
March 13, 1998: VOTE: SUSPEND THE RULES R (36-Y 0-N)
March 12, 1998: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
March 6, 1998: Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (135)
Type:
Primary Sponsor