+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (21)
On April 10, 1998 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ415ER)
On March 6, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reading waived
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Rules suspended (38-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: SUSPEND THE RULES R (38-Y 0-N)
- Discharged from Rules
- Reading waived
- Taken up for immediate consideration
- Reading waived
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
On March 5, 1998 in the House:
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Title replaced
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Printed as engrossed 985825112-E
- Agreed to by House (Block Vote) (98-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On March 4, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from Rules with amendments (14-Y 0-N)
On March 3, 1998 in the House:
- Consent to introduce
- Presented & ordered printed 985825112
- Referred to Committee on Rules