+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On March 11, 1997 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ401ER)
On February 19, 1997 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
- Read third time
On February 18, 1997 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
- Reading waived, passed by for the day (39-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 1997 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules by voice vote
On February 6, 1997 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Reading waived (40-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 1997 in the House:
- Engrossed by House
- VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N)
- Agreed to by House (99-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 3, 1997 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 2, 1997 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 1, 1997 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On January 31, 1997 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On January 29, 1997 in the House:
- Reported from Rules (10-Y 0-N)
On January 8, 1997 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 12/19/96 974791410
+ − Votes (3)
February 18, 1997: VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
February 4, 1997: VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N)
January 29, 1997: Reported from Rules (10-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor