+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On March 11, 2016 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ372ER)
On March 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Reading waived (40-Y 0-N)
- Read second time
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules (12-Y 0-N)
On March 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Reading waived
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N 2-A)
- Agreed to by House (97-Y 0-N 2-A)
- Engrossed by House
- Taken up
On February 29, 2016 in the House:
- Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N)
On February 26, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Presented and ordered printed 16105732D
+ − Votes (5)
March 11, 2016: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N)
March 11, 2016: Agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
March 10, 2016: Reported from Rules (12-Y 0-N)
March 2, 2016: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N 2-A)
February 29, 2016: Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor